Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 15, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, February 21, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Recognizing Texas as a Purple Heart State.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22

Urging Congress to recognize the importance of trade between Texas and Mexico.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 22, 2017, and ending on Monday, February 27, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Urging the United States Congress to continue joint federal-state funding of Texas Medicaid while transferring administration of the program to the Texas Legislature.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR25

Recognizing the Mount Tabor Indian Community for its contributions to this state.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26

Urging Congress to review federal regulations on the oil and gas industry.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR27

Designating Stamford as the Western Art Show Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR28

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 1, 2017, and ending on Monday, March 6, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR29

Designating Dripping Springs as the official Wedding Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR3

Claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to halt and reverse certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR30

Granting Barbara Stegall permission to sue the Texas Municipal League, TML MultiState Intergovernmental Employee Benefits Pool, Inc., and UMR, Inc.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR31

Expressing opposition to using eminent domain for the construction of a wall or fence along the U.S.-Mexico border.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR32

Urging Congress to provide sufficient federal funding for the construction of a storm surge barrier along the Texas coast.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR33

Approving the amended 2009 settlement agreement between the State of Texas and the U.S. Department of Justice.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records