|
06/14/2019
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Record vote RV#1787
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Nelson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#489
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|