Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2984 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2984
1+By: Allison, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2984
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
3+ April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0;
6+ May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2984 By: Taylor
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology
6- applications curriculum and the establishment of a computer science
7- strategic advisory committee to increase computer science
8- instruction and participation in public schools.
14+ applications curriculum.
915 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1016 SECTION 1. Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
1117 adding Subsection (c-3) to read as follows:
1218 (c-3) In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for the
1319 technology applications curriculum for kindergarten through grade
1420 eight, the State Board of Education shall adopt essential knowledge
1521 and skills that include coding, computer programming,
1622 computational thinking, and cybersecurity. The State Board of
1723 Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
1824 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum
1925 every five years to ensure the curriculum:
2026 (1) is relevant to student education; and
2127 (2) aligns with current or emerging professions.
22- SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
23- amended by adding Section 28.0181 to read as follows:
24- Sec. 28.0181. COMPUTER SCIENCE STRATEGIC ADVISORY
25- COMMITTEE. (a)
26- In this section, "advisory committee" means the
27- computer science strategic advisory committee established under
28- this section.
29- (b) The agency shall establish the computer science
30- strategic advisory committee to develop and provide
31- recommendations for increasing computer science instruction and
32- participation in public schools.
33- (c) The advisory committee is composed of at least 11
34- members. The members must include:
35- (1) two members appointed by the governor;
36- (2) two members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
37- (3) two members appointed by the speaker of the house
38- of representatives;
39- (4) one member appointed by the chair of the senate
40- committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary
41- education;
42- (5) one member appointed by the chair of the senate
43- committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education;
44- (6) one member appointed by the chair of the house of
45- representatives committee with primary jurisdiction over primary
46- and secondary education;
47- (7) one member appointed by the chair of the house of
48- representatives committee with primary jurisdiction over higher
49- education;
50- (8) one member appointed by the chair of the State
51- Board of Education; and
52- (9) any other members added by the advisory committee
53- in a manner determined by the committee in the committee's
54- discretion.
55- (d) In appointing members to the advisory committee, the
56- governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
57- representatives shall coordinate appointments to ensure that the
58- six individuals appointed to the advisory committee collectively by
59- those officers include:
60- (1) three educators who teach in a public school and
61- are certified in computer science;
62- (2) one parent or person standing in parental relation
63- to a student enrolled in a public school;
64- (3) one person employed in the technology industry;
65- and
66- (4) one faculty member of an institution of higher
67- education.
68- (e) The governor shall designate a member of the advisory
69- committee as the presiding officer of the advisory committee to
70- serve in that capacity at the pleasure of the governor.
71- (f) The advisory committee may hold public meetings.
72- (g) Members of the advisory committee are not entitled to
73- compensation but are entitled to reimbursement for actual and
74- necessary expenses incurred in fulfilling committee duties.
75- (h) Staff members of the agency shall provide
76- administrative support for the advisory committee.
77- (i) Funding for the administrative and operational expenses
78- of the advisory committee shall be provided by appropriation to the
79- agency for that purpose.
80- (j) Not later than September 1, 2020, the advisory committee
81- shall submit to the governor and the legislature a report that
82- includes recommended changes to state law, including funding
83- proposals and timelines for the implementation of the recommended
84- changes. The report shall include recommendations that are intended
85- to:
86- (1) increase the number of certified computer science
87- teachers;
88- (2) increase the number of public high schools
89- offering computer science courses;
90- (3) increase the number of high school students
91- enrolled in computer science courses;
92- (4) encourage the enrollment of diverse student
93- populations in computer science courses; and
94- (5) expand computer science learning opportunities,
95- including computer programming, computer coding, cybersecurity,
96- and computational thinking, in public schools.
97- (k) The advisory committee is abolished and this section
98- expires January 1, 2021.
99- SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date
100- of this Act, the appropriate persons, as provided by Section
101- 28.0181(c), Education Code, as added by this Act, shall appoint
102- members to the computer science strategic advisory committee.
103- SECTION 4. Not later than December 31, 2020, the State Board
28+ SECTION 2. Not later than December 31, 2020, the State Board
10429 of Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
10530 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum as
10631 required by Section 28.002(c-3), Education Code, as added by this
10732 Act.
108- SECTION 5. The State Board of Education is required to
33+ SECTION 3. The State Board of Education is required to
10934 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
11035 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
11136 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
11237 purpose, the board may, but is not required to, implement a
11338 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
11439 purpose.
115- SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
40+ SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
11641 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
11742 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
11843 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
11944 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 2984 was passed by the House on April
123- 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 9, 1 present, not
124- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
125- No. 2984 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
126- 1 present, not voting.
127- ______________________________
128- Chief Clerk of the House
129- I certify that H.B. No. 2984 was passed by the Senate, with
130- amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
131- 0.
132- ______________________________
133- Secretary of the Senate
134- APPROVED: __________________
135- Date
136- __________________
137- Governor
45+ * * * * *