Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019