Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2984 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 2984


 AN ACT
 relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology
 applications curriculum and the establishment of a computer science
 strategic advisory committee to increase computer science
 instruction and participation in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-3) to read as follows:
 (c-3)  In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for the
 technology applications curriculum for kindergarten through grade
 eight, the State Board of Education shall adopt essential knowledge
 and skills that include coding, computer programming,
 computational thinking, and cybersecurity.  The State Board of
 Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum
 every five years to ensure the curriculum:
 (1)  is relevant to student education; and
 (2)  aligns with current or emerging professions.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0181 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0181.  COMPUTER SCIENCE STRATEGIC ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE. (a)
 In this section, "advisory committee" means the
 computer science strategic advisory committee established under
 this section.
 (b)  The agency shall establish the computer science
 strategic advisory committee to develop and provide
 recommendations for increasing computer science instruction and
 participation in public schools.
 (c)  The advisory committee is composed of at least 11
 members. The members must include:
 (1)  two members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  two members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives;
 (4)  one member appointed by the chair of the senate
 committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary
 education;
 (5)  one member appointed by the chair of the senate
 committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education;
 (6)  one member appointed by the chair of the house of
 representatives committee with primary jurisdiction over primary
 and secondary education;
 (7)  one member appointed by the chair of the house of
 representatives committee with primary jurisdiction over higher
 education;
 (8)  one member appointed by the chair of the State
 Board of Education; and
 (9)  any other members added by the advisory committee
 in a manner determined by the committee in the committee's
 discretion.
 (d)  In appointing members to the advisory committee, the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall coordinate appointments to ensure that the
 six individuals appointed to the advisory committee collectively by
 those officers include:
 (1)  three educators who teach in a public school and
 are certified in computer science;
 (2)  one parent or person standing in parental relation
 to a student enrolled in a public school;
 (3)  one person employed in the technology industry;
 and
 (4)  one faculty member of an institution of higher
 education.
 (e)  The governor shall designate a member of the advisory
 committee as the presiding officer of the advisory committee to
 serve in that capacity at the pleasure of the governor.
 (f)  The advisory committee may hold public meetings.
 (g)  Members of the advisory committee are not entitled to
 compensation but are entitled to reimbursement for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in fulfilling committee duties.
 (h)  Staff members of the agency shall provide
 administrative support for the advisory committee.
 (i)  Funding for the administrative and operational expenses
 of the advisory committee shall be provided by appropriation to the
 agency for that purpose.
 (j)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the advisory committee
 shall submit to the governor and the legislature a report that
 includes recommended changes to state law, including funding
 proposals and timelines for the implementation of the recommended
 changes. The report shall include recommendations that are intended
 to:
 (1)  increase the number of certified computer science
 teachers;
 (2)  increase the number of public high schools
 offering computer science courses;
 (3)  increase the number of high school students
 enrolled in computer science courses;
 (4)  encourage the enrollment of diverse student
 populations in computer science courses; and
 (5)  expand computer science learning opportunities,
 including computer programming, computer coding, cybersecurity,
 and computational thinking, in public schools.
 (k)  The advisory committee is abolished and this section
 expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the appropriate persons, as provided by Section
 28.0181(c), Education Code, as added by this Act, shall appoint
 members to the computer science strategic advisory committee.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than December 31, 2020, the State Board
 of Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
 knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum as
 required by Section 28.002(c-3), Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 5.  The State Board of Education is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the board may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2984 was passed by the House on April
 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 9, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2984 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2984 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor