Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#258
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Amended 2-Schofield
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Amended 1-Bowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|