1 | | - | By: Bowers, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1262 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
3 | | - | May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
4 | | - | Justice; May 19, 2021, rereferred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
5 | | - | May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
6 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, |
---|
7 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
8 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
9 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1262 By: Hughes |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bowers, Ortega, Collier, Raymond, et al. H.B. No. 1262 |
---|
17 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, is |
---|
18 | | - | amended to read as follows: |
---|
19 | | - | (j) As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the |
---|
20 | | - | commission shall require an officer to complete a 40-hour statewide |
---|
21 | | - | education and training program on de-escalation and crisis |
---|
22 | | - | intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons |
---|
23 | | - | with mental impairments. The program must include instruction on |
---|
24 | | - | interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other |
---|
25 | | - | dementias, including instruction on techniques for recognizing |
---|
26 | | - | symptoms, communicating effectively, employing alternatives to |
---|
27 | | - | physical restraints, and identifying signs of abuse, neglect, or |
---|
28 | | - | exploitation. An officer shall complete the program not later than |
---|
29 | | - | the second anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under |
---|
30 | | - | this chapter or the date the officer applies for an intermediate |
---|
31 | | - | proficiency certificate, whichever date is earlier. An officer may |
---|
32 | | - | not satisfy the requirements of this subsection or Section |
---|
33 | | - | 1701.402(g) by taking an online course on de-escalation and crisis |
---|
34 | | - | intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons |
---|
35 | | - | with mental impairments. |
---|
36 | | - | SECTION 2. Not later than April 1, 2022, the Texas |
---|
37 | | - | Commission on Law Enforcement shall revise the commission's |
---|
38 | | - | education and training programs as necessary to implement the |
---|
39 | | - | changes in law made by this Act. |
---|
40 | | - | SECTION 3. Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, as |
---|
41 | | - | amended by this Act, applies only to a person who submits an |
---|
42 | | - | application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701, |
---|
43 | | - | Occupations Code, on or after April 1, 2022. A person who submits |
---|
44 | | - | an application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701, |
---|
45 | | - | Occupations Code, before April 1, 2022, is governed by the law in |
---|
46 | | - | effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the |
---|
47 | | - | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
| 9 | + | SECTION 1. Section 1701.352, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
| 10 | + | by adding Subsection (j) to read as follows: |
---|
| 11 | + | (j) A peace officer who is employed by the law enforcement |
---|
| 12 | + | agency of a political subdivision located wholly or partly in a |
---|
| 13 | + | county with a population of 200,000 or more must complete as part of |
---|
| 14 | + | the course provided for the officer under Subsection (b) a one-time |
---|
| 15 | + | training program established by the commission on techniques to |
---|
| 16 | + | facilitate interactions with homeless youth and adults and on the |
---|
| 17 | + | resources available to those individuals. The training program |
---|
| 18 | + | must be completed not later than the second anniversary of the date |
---|
| 19 | + | the officer was hired. |
---|
| 20 | + | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas |
---|
| 21 | + | Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish the training program |
---|
| 22 | + | required by Section 1701.352(j), Occupations Code, as added by this |
---|
| 23 | + | Act. |
---|
| 24 | + | SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 1701.352(j), |
---|
| 25 | + | Occupations Code, as added by this Act, a peace officer who on |
---|
| 26 | + | January 1, 2022, is employed by a law enforcement agency to which |
---|
| 27 | + | that section applies must complete the training required by that |
---|
| 28 | + | section not later than January 1, 2024. |
---|