Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021