Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1262 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Bowers, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1262
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2021, rereferred to Committee on State Affairs;
 May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1262 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to education and training for peace officers on
 interacting with certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (j)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer to complete a 40-hour statewide
 education and training program on de-escalation and crisis
 intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons
 with mental impairments. The program must include instruction on
 interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other
 dementias, including instruction on techniques for recognizing
 symptoms, communicating effectively, employing alternatives to
 physical restraints, and identifying signs of abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation. An officer shall complete the program not later than
 the second anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under
 this chapter or the date the officer applies for an intermediate
 proficiency certificate, whichever date is earlier. An officer may
 not satisfy the requirements of this subsection or Section
 1701.402(g) by taking an online course on de-escalation and crisis
 intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons
 with mental impairments.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than April 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall revise the commission's
 education and training programs as necessary to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a person who submits an
 application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701,
 Occupations Code, on or after April 1, 2022. A person who submits
 an application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701,
 Occupations Code, before April 1, 2022, is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *