Senate | 05/26/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred to Administration | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Record vote RV#189 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Record vote RV#181 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Filed |