Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021