Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1600 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1600
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2021;
3- April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Administration; May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
6- May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1600 By: Buckingham
1+87R10538 MCK-D
2+ By: Canales H.B. No. 1600
93
104
115 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
126 AN ACT
137 relating to the review date for certain governmental entities
148 subject to the sunset review process.
159 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1610 SECTION 1. Section 11.003, Agriculture Code, is amended to
1711 read as follows:
1812 Sec. 11.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Department of
1913 Agriculture is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
2014 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
2115 chapter, the department is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
2216 SECTION 2. Section 74.127(a), Agriculture Code, is amended
2317 to read as follows:
2418 (a) The board of directors of the official cotton growers'
2519 boll weevil eradication foundation is subject to Chapter 325,
2620 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence
2721 as provided by that chapter, the board is abolished and this
2822 subchapter expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
2923 SECTION 3. Section 161.027, Agriculture Code, is amended to
3024 read as follows:
3125 Sec. 161.027. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Animal Health
3226 Commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
3327 Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
3428 the commission is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
3529 SECTION 4. Section 54.603, Education Code, is amended to
3630 read as follows:
3731 Sec. 54.603. SUNSET PROVISION. The Prepaid Higher
3832 Education Tuition Board is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code
3933 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by
4034 that chapter, the board is abolished and the programs established
4135 under this subchapter and under Subchapters G and H terminate
4236 September 1, 2023 [2021].
4337 SECTION 5. Section 15.212, Finance Code, is amended to read
4438 as follows:
4539 Sec. 15.212. SUNSET PROVISION. The Credit Union Department
4640 and the Credit Union Commission are subject to Chapter 325,
4741 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence
4842 as provided by that chapter, the department and commission are
4943 abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
5044 SECTION 6. Section 419.003, Government Code, is amended to
5145 read as follows:
5246 Sec. 419.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Commission on
5347 Fire Protection is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).
5448 Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the
5549 commission is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023
5650 [2021].
5751 SECTION 7. Section 449.002, Government Code, is amended to
5852 read as follows:
5953 Sec. 449.002. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Holocaust and
6054 Genocide Commission is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).
6155 Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the
6256 commission is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023
6357 [2021].
6458 SECTION 8. Section 481.003, Government Code, is amended to
6559 read as follows:
6660 Sec. 481.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Economic
6761 Development and Tourism Office is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas
6862 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
6963 chapter, the office is abolished and this chapter expires September
7064 1, 2023 [2021].
7165 SECTION 9. Section 511.003, Government Code, is amended to
7266 read as follows:
7367 Sec. 511.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Commission on Jail
7468 Standards is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
7569 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the commission
7670 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
7771 SECTION 10. Section 751.003, Government Code, is amended to
7872 read as follows:
7973 Sec. 751.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Office of
8074 State-Federal Relations is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset
8175 Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
8276 the office is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023
8377 [2021].
8478 SECTION 11. Section 825.006, Government Code, is amended to
8579 read as follows:
8680 Sec. 825.006. SUNSET PROVISION. The board of trustees of
8781 the Teacher Retirement System of Texas is subject to review under
8882 Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act), but is not abolished under that
8983 chapter. The board shall be reviewed during the period in which
9084 state agencies abolished in 2023 [2021], and every 12th year after
9185 that year, are reviewed.
9286 SECTION 12. Section 691.003, Health and Safety Code, is
9387 amended to read as follows:
9488 Sec. 691.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Anatomical Board of
9589 the State of Texas is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
9690 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
9791 chapter, the board is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
9892 SECTION 13. Section 51.002(a), Occupations Code, is amended
9993 to read as follows:
10094 (a) The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation and the
10195 Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation are subject to Chapter
10296 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in
10397 existence as provided by that chapter, the commission and the
10498 department are abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
10599 SECTION 14. Section 801.003, Occupations Code, is amended
106100 to read as follows:
107101 Sec. 801.003. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The State Board of
108102 Veterinary Medical Examiners is subject to Chapter 325, Government
109103 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
110104 by that chapter, the board is abolished and this chapter expires
111105 September 1, 2023 [2021].
112106 SECTION 15. Section 1701.002, Occupations Code, is amended
113107 to read as follows:
114108 Sec. 1701.002. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas
115109 Commission on Law Enforcement is subject to Chapter 325, Government
116110 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
117111 by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter
118112 expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
119113 SECTION 16. Section 2021.008(a), Occupations Code, is
120114 amended to read as follows:
121115 (a) The commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government
122116 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
123117 by that chapter, and except as provided by Subsections (b) and (c),
124118 the commission is abolished and this subtitle expires September 1,
125119 2023 [2021].
126120 SECTION 17. Section 11.0111, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
127121 amended to read as follows:
128122 Sec. 11.0111. SUNSET PROVISION. The Parks and Wildlife
129123 Department is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
130124 Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
131125 the department is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
132126 SECTION 18. Section 8502.0021(a), Special District Local
133127 Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
134128 (a) The authority is subject to review under Chapter 325,
135129 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), but may not be abolished under
136130 that chapter. The review shall be conducted under Section 325.025,
137131 Government Code, as if the authority were a state agency scheduled
138132 to be abolished September 1, 2023 [2021], and every 12th year after
139133 that year.
140134 SECTION 19. If a conflict exists between this Act and
141135 another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, that
142- amends or repeals the sunset date of a governmental entity, the
143- provisions of the other Act control without regard to the relative
144- dates of enactment.
136+ extends the sunset date of a governmental entity, the provisions of
137+ the other Act control without regard to the relative dates of
138+ enactment.
145139 SECTION 20. This Act takes effect immediately if it
146140 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
147141 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
148142 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
149143 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
150- * * * * *