Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1600 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/06/2021

                            By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 1600
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2021;
 April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1600 By:  Buckingham


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the review date for certain governmental entities
 subject to the sunset review process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.003, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 11.003.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Department of
 Agriculture is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
 Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the department is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  Section 74.127(a), Agriculture Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board of directors of the official cotton growers'
 boll weevil eradication foundation is subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the board is abolished and this
 subchapter expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 3.  Section 161.027, Agriculture Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 161.027.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Texas Animal Health
 Commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
 Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
 the commission is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 4.  Section 54.603, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.603.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Prepaid Higher
 Education Tuition Board is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code
 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by
 that chapter, the board is abolished and the programs established
 under this subchapter and under Subchapters G and H terminate
 September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 5.  Section 15.212, Finance Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 15.212.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Credit Union Department
 and the Credit Union Commission are subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the department and commission are
 abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 6.  Section 419.003, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 419.003.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Commission on
 Fire Protection is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).
 Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the
 commission is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023
 [2021].
 SECTION 7.  Section 449.002, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 449.002.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Holocaust and
 Genocide Commission is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).
 Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the
 commission is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023
 [2021].
 SECTION 8.  Section 481.003, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 481.003.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Texas Economic
 Development and Tourism Office is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas
 Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the office is abolished and this chapter expires September
 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 9.  Section 511.003, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 511.003.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Commission on Jail
 Standards is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the commission
 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 10.  Section 751.003, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 751.003.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Office of
 State-Federal Relations is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset
 Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
 the office is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023
 [2021].
 SECTION 11.  Section 825.006, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 825.006.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The board of trustees of
 the Teacher Retirement System of Texas is subject to review under
 Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act), but is not abolished under that
 chapter.  The board shall be reviewed during the period in which
 state agencies abolished in 2023 [2021], and every 12th year after
 that year, are reviewed.
 SECTION 12.  Section 691.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 691.003.  SUNSET PROVISION.  The Anatomical Board of
 the State of Texas is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas
 Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that
 chapter, the board is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 13.  Section 51.002(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation and the
 Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation are subject to Chapter
 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in
 existence as provided by that chapter, the commission and the
 department are abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 14.  Section 801.003, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 801.003.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The State Board of
 Veterinary Medical Examiners is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the board is abolished and this chapter expires
 September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 15.  Section 1701.002, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.002.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 16.  Section 2021.008(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, and except as provided by Subsections (b) and (c),
 the commission is abolished and this subtitle expires September 1,
 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 17.  Section 11.0111, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.0111.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Parks and Wildlife
 Department is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset
 Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter,
 the department is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 18.  Section 8502.0021(a), Special District Local
 Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The authority is subject to review under Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act), but may not be abolished under
 that chapter.  The review shall be conducted under Section 325.025,
 Government Code, as if the authority were a state agency scheduled
 to be abolished September 1, 2023 [2021], and every 12th year after
 that year.
 SECTION 19.  If a conflict exists between this Act and
 another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, that
 amends or repeals the sunset date of a governmental entity, the
 provisions of the other Act control without regard to the relative
 dates of enactment.
 SECTION 20.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *