Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2171 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Metcalf (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2171
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 13, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2171 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and
 emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health
 benefits coverage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 175.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 175.001. APPLICABILITY.  This chapter applies to a
 person who:
 (1)  retires from:
 (A)  county employment in a county with a
 population of 75,000 or more;
 (B)  employment by an appraisal district in a
 county with a population of 75,000 or more; [or]
 (C)  municipal employment in a municipality with a
 population of 25,000 or more; or
 (D)  employment as a firefighter or emergency
 medical services provider by an emergency services district located
 wholly or partly in a county with a population of 150,000 or more;
 and
 (2)  is entitled to receive retirement benefits from a
 county, appraisal district, or municipal retirement plan or
 emergency services district.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies according to its terms to all eligible
 persons who leave employment with an emergency services district on
 or after January 1, 2022.
 (b)  An emergency services district that is required by
 Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as amended by this Act, to
 provide continued health benefits coverage but that is not allowed
 to provide the coverage under the terms of the district's existing
 group health plan shall ensure that the required continued health
 benefits coverage is provided for in any new plan that is adopted by
 the district on or after January 1, 2022, unless the district is
 exempted under Section 175.007, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *