Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2171 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            H.B. No. 2171


 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and
 emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health
 benefits coverage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 175.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 175.001.  APPLICABILITY.  This chapter applies to a
 person who:
 (1)  retires from:
 (A)  county employment in a county with a
 population of 75,000 or more;
 (B)  employment by an appraisal district in a
 county with a population of 75,000 or more; [or]
 (C)  municipal employment in a municipality with a
 population of 25,000 or more; or
 (D)  employment as a firefighter or emergency
 medical services provider by an emergency services district located
 wholly or partly in a county with a population of 150,000 or more;
 and
 (2)  is entitled to receive retirement benefits from a
 county, appraisal district, or municipal retirement plan or
 emergency services district.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies according to its terms to all eligible
 persons who leave employment with an emergency services district on
 or after January 1, 2022.
 (b)  An emergency services district that is required by
 Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as amended by this Act, to
 provide continued health benefits coverage but that is not allowed
 to provide the coverage under the terms of the district's existing
 group health plan shall ensure that the required continued health
 benefits coverage is provided for in any new plan that is adopted by
 the district on or after January 1, 2022, unless the district is
 exempted under Section 175.007, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2171 was passed by the House on April
 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 14, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2171 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2171 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor