Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021