1 | | - | H.B. No. 2171 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Metcalf (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2171 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 13, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 13, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2171 By: Paxton |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the eligibility of certain retired firefighters and |
---|
6 | 14 | | emergency medical services providers to purchase continued health |
---|
7 | 15 | | benefits coverage. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 175.001, Local Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 175.001. APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies to a |
---|
12 | 20 | | person who: |
---|
13 | 21 | | (1) retires from: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (A) county employment in a county with a |
---|
15 | 23 | | population of 75,000 or more; |
---|
16 | 24 | | (B) employment by an appraisal district in a |
---|
17 | 25 | | county with a population of 75,000 or more; [or] |
---|
18 | 26 | | (C) municipal employment in a municipality with a |
---|
19 | 27 | | population of 25,000 or more; or |
---|
20 | 28 | | (D) employment as a firefighter or emergency |
---|
21 | 29 | | medical services provider by an emergency services district located |
---|
22 | 30 | | wholly or partly in a county with a population of 150,000 or more; |
---|
23 | 31 | | and |
---|
24 | 32 | | (2) is entitled to receive retirement benefits from a |
---|
25 | 33 | | county, appraisal district, or municipal retirement plan or |
---|
26 | 34 | | emergency services district. |
---|
27 | 35 | | SECTION 2. (a) Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as |
---|
28 | 36 | | amended by this Act, applies according to its terms to all eligible |
---|
29 | 37 | | persons who leave employment with an emergency services district on |
---|
30 | 38 | | or after January 1, 2022. |
---|
31 | 39 | | (b) An emergency services district that is required by |
---|
32 | 40 | | Chapter 175, Local Government Code, as amended by this Act, to |
---|
33 | 41 | | provide continued health benefits coverage but that is not allowed |
---|
34 | 42 | | to provide the coverage under the terms of the district's existing |
---|
35 | 43 | | group health plan shall ensure that the required continued health |
---|
36 | 44 | | benefits coverage is provided for in any new plan that is adopted by |
---|
37 | 45 | | the district on or after January 1, 2022, unless the district is |
---|
38 | 46 | | exempted under Section 175.007, Local Government Code. |
---|
39 | 47 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2171 was passed by the House on April |
---|
43 | | - | 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 14, 2 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
45 | | - | No. 2171 on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, |
---|
46 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2171 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
50 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
51 | | - | 0. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 48 | + | * * * * * |
---|