Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1699 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/19/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB6
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
04/27/2023 8:45 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/22/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 10 2023 10:27PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2023 8:45AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/11/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB8
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Education
04/10/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/21/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23