Last Action: 04/18/2023 H 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 24 2023 4:18PM
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Education
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice