Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB639 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/15/2023 12:30 pm
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/06/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/05/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/05/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/15/2023 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 03/15/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor