Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB793 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: May 12 2023 12:02AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Referred to Human Services: May 15 2023 4:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/20/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 20 2023 1:01AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/23/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
04/11/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB8
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Education
04/10/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/14/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Considered in Calendars