LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1151
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1151
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1151
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/21/2023
8:30 am
Criminal Justice Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.016
SB37
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB129
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB224
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
SB432
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB465
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB467
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB509
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB947
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1151
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 3 2023 2:31PM
SB1173
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed