Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB159 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/21/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 17 2023 4:34PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
03/07/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/07/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar