E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2039
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 2039
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1711
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1607
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1607
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3081
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3081
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1483
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#418
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Harless
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1024
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1284
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 252
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 198
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|