Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB500 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 500


 AN ACT
 relating to the value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded
 as a prize at a charitable raffle.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2002.056(b-1), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded
 as a prize at a raffle that is purchased by the organization or for
 which the organization provides any consideration may not exceed
 $750,000 [$250,000].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a charitable raffle conducted under Chapter 2002, Occupations
 Code, for which a residential dwelling is offered or awarded as a
 prize on or after the effective date of this Act.  A charitable
 raffle conducted under Chapter 2002, Occupations Code, for which a
 residential dwelling is offered or awarded as a prize before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the prize was offered or awarded, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the Senate on
 April 6, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 2, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 5, 2023, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 17, 2023, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the House, with
 amendments, on April 21, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 109,
 Nays 30, one present not voting; May 5, 2023, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 15, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 123, Nays 21, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor