Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB500 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 15, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 19, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 30, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Conference Committee Report*

Bill
Fiscal Note