1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 500 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded |
---|
6 | 6 | | as a prize at a charitable raffle. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 2002.056(b-1), Occupations Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (b-1) The value of a residential dwelling offered or awarded |
---|
11 | 11 | | as a prize at a raffle that is purchased by the organization or for |
---|
12 | 12 | | which the organization provides any consideration may not exceed |
---|
13 | 13 | | $750,000 [$250,000]. |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
15 | 15 | | to a charitable raffle conducted under Chapter 2002, Occupations |
---|
16 | 16 | | Code, for which a residential dwelling is offered or awarded as a |
---|
17 | 17 | | prize on or after the effective date of this Act. A charitable |
---|
18 | 18 | | raffle conducted under Chapter 2002, Occupations Code, for which a |
---|
19 | 19 | | residential dwelling is offered or awarded as a prize before the |
---|
20 | 20 | | effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the |
---|
21 | 21 | | date the prize was offered or awarded, and the former law is |
---|
22 | 22 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
24 | 24 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
25 | 25 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
26 | 26 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the Senate on |
---|
27 | 27 | | April 6, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
28 | 28 | | May 2, 2023, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
29 | 29 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 5, 2023, House |
---|
30 | 30 | | granted request of the Senate; May 17, 2023, Senate adopted |
---|
31 | 31 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
32 | 32 | | Nays 0. |
---|
33 | 33 | | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | 34 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
35 | 35 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the House, with |
---|
36 | 36 | | amendments, on April 21, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 109, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Nays 30, one present not voting; May 5, 2023, House granted request |
---|
38 | 38 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
39 | 39 | | May 15, 2023, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
40 | 40 | | following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 21, one present not voting. |
---|
41 | 41 | | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | 42 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
43 | 43 | | Approved: |
---|
44 | 44 | | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | 45 | | Date |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | Governor |
---|