Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB895 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/16/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
05/15/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
05/15/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
03/14/2023 8:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 14 2023 11:51AM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/14/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23