Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR9 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/09/2023 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
SB9
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/30/2023 2:00 pm
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 10 2023 3:28PM
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 10 2023 3:28PM
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Signed by the Governor