LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th 4th C.S.
Senate
Bills
SB3
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.
Texas Senate Bill SB3
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
11/14/2023
House Daily Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB3
Enrolled
Last Action: 12/18/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
SB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 12/18/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
11/09/2023
3:15 pm
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
2E.9
SB2
Engrossed
Last Action: 11/10/2023 H Referred to Educational Opportunity & Enrichment, Select: Nov 10 2023 9:01AM
SB3
Enrolled
Last Action: 12/18/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .