Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2680 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 5:36PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 9:51PM