Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB420 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/25/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Administration
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
04/17/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Administration
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 1:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Adopted
03/12/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/12/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars