05/08/2025 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/08/2025 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1828 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1575 | Journal Page: 3092 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1499 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2986 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2985 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1531 | Journal Page: 2945 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2070 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1305 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 227 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |