Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2024
Analysis November 22, 2024
Fiscal Note November 22, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis May 5, 2025
Bill May 5, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 14, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2025
Analysis April 11, 2025
Analysis April 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2025
Fiscal Note April 5, 2025