Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB463 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/07/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 463




 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of facility for purposes of workplace
 violence prevention requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 331.001(3), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Facility" means:
 (A)  a home and community support services agency
 licensed or licensed and certified under Chapter 142 [to provide
 home health services as defined by Section 142.001] that employs at
 least two registered nurses;
 (B)  a hospital licensed under Chapter 241 and a
 hospital maintained or operated by an agency of this state that is
 exempt from licensing under that chapter;
 (C)  a nursing facility licensed under Chapter 242
 that employs at least two registered nurses;
 (D)  an ambulatory surgical center licensed under
 Chapter 243;
 (E)  a freestanding emergency medical care
 facility as defined by Section 254.001; [and]
 (F)  a mental hospital licensed under Chapter 577;
 (G)  an intermediate care facility for
 individuals with an intellectual disability licensed under Chapter
 252; and
 (H)  a state supported living center as defined by
 Section 531.002.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2026, a home and
 community support services agency, intermediate care facility for
 individuals with an intellectual disability, or state supported
 living center that becomes subject to Chapter 331, Health and
 Safety Code, under Section 331.001, Health and Safety Code, as
 amended by this Act, shall comply with the requirements of that
 chapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 463 passed the Senate on
 April 24, 2025, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 463 passed the House on
 May 7, 2025, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor