Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR393 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/16/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 23 2025 3:17PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs