Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Local & Consent Calendars: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:48PM