Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR511 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/14/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 15 2025 4:50PM
HB9
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 15 2025 9:46PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:02PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:10PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/16/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported enrolled
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:32PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:36PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
HB4
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Border Security
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs