Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 15 2025 4:50PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 15 2025 9:46PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:02PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:10PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/16/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:32PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:36PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Border Security
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs