Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/19/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/12/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/05/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Education
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/29/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Failed to pass to engrossment
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
03/22/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H No action taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Education