Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Senate Jurisprudence Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/23/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
05/22/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
05/17/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/28/2023 H Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 17 2023 4:34PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
05/10/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/16/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
05/03/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 15 2023 4:58PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/19/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
03/29/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Point of order sustained
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/22/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23