LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Committees
Jurisprudence
Calendar
TX
Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/29/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/28/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/23/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB629
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:55PM
SB1015
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:56PM
SB2501
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Vote taken in committee
SB2933
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Corrected comm. report printed & distributed: Apr 30 2025 8:00PM
04/23/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB629
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:55PM
SB1015
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:56PM
SB2501
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Vote taken in committee
SB2933
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Corrected comm. report printed & distributed: Apr 30 2025 8:00PM
04/16/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB66
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:57PM
SB2165
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Vote taken in committee
SB2342
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:57PM
SB2878
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
SB2903
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:56PM
04/16/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB66
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:57PM
SB2165
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Vote taken in committee
SB2342
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:57PM
SB2878
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
SB2903
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 30 2025 3:56PM
04/09/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB302
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB1335
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
SB1734
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
SB1760
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
SB1975
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 10 2025 5:30PM
SB2127
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
04/03/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
03/26/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB387
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
SB1650
Introduced
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1838
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
SB1839
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
SB1923
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
SB1940
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
SB2052
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
03/20/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
03/19/2025
Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB711
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Signed in the Senate
SB746
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
SB942
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
SB1403
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
SB1404
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
SB1448
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
SB1536
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
SB1559
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM