Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 14, 2021
Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 3, 2021