Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0877 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2022