Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia House Bill HB1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 16, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024