Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB40 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 26, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 3, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 18, 2025
Bill February 17, 2025