Louisiana 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR20

Introduced
3/30/10  
Refer
3/30/10  
Report Pass
4/26/10  

Caption

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2010-2011 adopted by BESE on March 11, 2010.

Impact

The implementation of SCR20 is expected to enhance the funding landscape for public education in Louisiana. The bill mandates that funding calculations are completed using the most current data and that final allocations be made prior to the start of each fiscal year, aiming for transparency and consistency. The proposed formula emphasizes not only equity in allocation but also the adequacy of funding, thereby reinforcing the commitment to providing all students with fair access to quality education and necessary resources, regardless of their residential area or school district.

Summary

SCR20 provides legislative approval for the Minimum Foundation Program (MFP) formula for the fiscal year 2010-2011. This bill, as developed by the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education, aims to establish a standardized method for determining educational funding for public elementary and secondary schools in Louisiana. By adopting this formula, the legislature seeks to ensure that funding is allocated equitably across city, parish, and other local public school systems, including the Recovery School District and Office of Juvenile Justice schools, ensuring that every district has the resources necessary to support its educational obligations.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR20 appears to be largely positive, with supporters emphasizing the need for a unified and structured approach to education funding. By legislating the MFP formula, proponents argue that it will create a more reliable and predictable funding environment for schools, enabling them to better prepare for operational costs and educational improvements. However, there may be contentions regarding the allocation discrepancies that could arise based on varying local tax revenues and economic conditions, especially in poorer districts. These disparities could fuel ongoing debates around the adequateness of educational funding.

Contention

Despite the favorable outlook, various stakeholders have expressed concerns regarding the efficacy of the formula in addressing the needs of all schools equitably. Some critics argue that the primary reliance on local revenue can lead to inequalities in funding, particularly disadvantaging lower-income districts that cannot generate sufficient tax income. This concern is compounded by potential operational challenges that districts may face if their allocated resources do not meet their actual needs or if unforeseen economic shifts affect their funding stability once the formula is applied. Thus, while SCR20 represents a step toward improved educational funding governance, it also opens up important discussions on balancing equity and adequacy in future allocations.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HCR243

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 10-11 adopted by BESE on June 8, 2010

LA HCR130

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 11-12 adopted by BESE on Feb. 17, 2011

LA SCR99

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2012-13 as adopted by BESE on February 27, 2012.

LA SCR23

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2013-2014 as adopted by BESE on March 8, 2013. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SCR55

Provides for legislative approval of the minimum foundation program formula for the 2014-2015 fiscal year. (8/1/14) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SCR48

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2018-2019 Fiscal Year. (EN +$3,045,000 SD EX See Note)

LA HCR7

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2017-18 (EN +$80,832,311 GF EX See Note)

LA HCR18

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2015-2016 fiscal year (EG +$84,762,481 GF EX See Note)