Louisiana 2013 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR23

Introduced
4/17/13  

Caption

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2013-2014 as adopted by BESE on March 8, 2013. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Impact

The proposed changes under SCR23 introduce four specific levels for calculating MFP allocations, with adjustments designed to accommodate student counts and funding incentives. The formula emphasizes equitable distribution of state and local contributions while offering incentives for local efforts in raising educational funds. Additionally, it addresses the needs of at-risk students, special education, and provides financial considerations for schools with significant achievement improvements. This adjustment is expected to have a notable impact on how funds are allocated across the state, ensuring that resources are directed to serve the specific needs of various school districts while addressing the diverse educational landscape in Louisiana.

Summary

SCR23 is a concurrent resolution aimed at securing legislative approval for the Minimum Foundation Program (MFP) funding formula for the fiscal year 2013-14 in Louisiana. The resolution outlines a revised approach to determine the cost of the MFP for public education, which includes elementary and secondary schools across various districts, including specific recovery and special schools. This new funding formula expands upon previous structures and integrates multiple levels of funding distribution designed to ensure a more equitable allocation of resources for all public educational institutions statewide.

Sentiment

Discussions surrounding SCR23 have shown a blend of optimism regarding funding equity along with concerns over potential implementation challenges. Supporters argue that the new formula better aligns financial resources with the needs of students and their respective school systems, thus fostering an environment that is conducive to educational success. Conversely, critics raise concerns about the nature of funding incentives intertwining local revenue efforts with state funding, which could create disparities in resource availability depending on local districts' economic capacities. This debate reflects broader tensions between ensuring adequate educational funding and managing the intricate realities of district-specific circumstances.

Contention

Key points of contention regarding SCR23 involve the balance between state control in funding distribution and local autonomy in educational governance. Opponents fear that the legislative endorsement of the revised MFP may lead to state overreach into local educational policymaking, effectively reshaping the function and operation of various school districts. Moreover, discussions about the consequences of student count manipulation in determining funding levels could present challenges in the long run. As the MFP formula is implemented, continued advocacy for local control over educational funding will likely remain a focal point in Louisiana’s educational policy discussions.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HCR243

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 10-11 adopted by BESE on June 8, 2010

LA HCR130

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 11-12 adopted by BESE on Feb. 17, 2011

LA SCR99

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2012-13 as adopted by BESE on February 27, 2012.

LA SCR20

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2010-2011 adopted by BESE on March 11, 2010.

LA HCR7

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2017-18 (EN +$80,832,311 GF EX See Note)

LA SCR55

Provides for legislative approval of the minimum foundation program formula for the 2014-2015 fiscal year. (8/1/14) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SCR48

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2018-2019 Fiscal Year. (EN +$3,045,000 SD EX See Note)

LA HCR18

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2015-2016 fiscal year (EG +$84,762,481 GF EX See Note)