Louisiana 2011 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR130

Introduced
5/25/11  
Refer
5/26/11  
Refer
6/1/11  
Refer
6/2/11  
Engrossed
6/16/11  
Report Pass
6/19/11  

Caption

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 11-12 adopted by BESE on Feb. 17, 2011

Impact

The bill carries significant implications for state education funding methodologies, ensuring that all children receive a fair opportunity for quality education. Goals outlined in the resolution emphasize equity, adequacy, local choice, and performance measures in the allocation of educational funds. It specifies that local governments need to bear some tax burden to support the educational programs adequately. The MFP formula is critical as it defines the principles of fairness and adequate funding tailored toward schools that cater to a diverse population, particularly those requiring additional educational support.

Summary

HCR130, also known as the House Concurrent Resolution 130, focuses on establishing a legally approved formula for determining the cost of the Minimum Foundation Program (MFP) for public elementary and secondary education in Louisiana. Introduced by Representative Austin Badon and Senator Thompson, the resolution aims to provide equitable funding to city, parish, and other local public school systems based on the formula adopted by the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (BESE) on February 17, 2011. This funding framework ensures that the educational needs of students are met while adhering to state laws regarding education finance.

Sentiment

The general sentiment surrounding HCR130 appears to be one of support across various educational stakeholders who see it as a necessary step for funding reforms in the education sector. However, there is also caution regarding the execution of the funding formula and its implications on community resources. Some critics express concerns that the reliance on local taxes might disproportionately affect underfunded districts, thus calling for a more sustainable financial mechanism that does not penalize disadvantaged communities. Overall, the bill has sparked discussions about the balance between state and local funding responsibilities.

Contention

While HCR130 is designed to improve fairness in school funding across Louisiana, notable points of contention arise in the context of how local financing mechanisms could disadvantage specific school districts, particularly those with limited tax bases. Some stakeholders argue that simply redistributing funds based on local tax revenues could exacerbate existing inequalities. Furthermore, the requirement for local taxpayers to support educational budgets raises potential issues regarding how these changes may hit lower-income communities harder than wealthier ones. Stakeholders urge for careful assessment and adjustments to prevent any adverse effects on students' educational outcomes.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HCR243

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 10-11 adopted by BESE on June 8, 2010

LA SCR99

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2012-13 as adopted by BESE on February 27, 2012.

LA SCR20

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2010-2011 adopted by BESE on March 11, 2010.

LA SCR23

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2013-2014 as adopted by BESE on March 8, 2013. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SCR55

Provides for legislative approval of the minimum foundation program formula for the 2014-2015 fiscal year. (8/1/14) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SCR48

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2018-2019 Fiscal Year. (EN +$3,045,000 SD EX See Note)

LA SCR3

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2019-2020 Fiscal Year. (EN +$145,214,142 GF EX See Note)

LA HCR7

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2017-18 (EN +$80,832,311 GF EX See Note)