Louisiana 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR99

Introduced
5/7/12  
Refer
5/8/12  
Report Pass
5/14/12  
Refer
5/15/12  
Report Pass
5/16/12  
Passed
5/21/12  
Engrossed
5/21/12  
Refer
5/21/12  

Caption

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2012-13 as adopted by BESE on February 27, 2012.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SCR23

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2013-2014 as adopted by BESE on March 8, 2013. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA HCR130

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 11-12 adopted by BESE on Feb. 17, 2011

LA HCR243

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 10-11 adopted by BESE on June 8, 2010

LA SCR20

Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2010-2011 adopted by BESE on March 11, 2010.

LA SCR55

Provides for legislative approval of the minimum foundation program formula for the 2014-2015 fiscal year. (8/1/14) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

LA SCR48

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2018-2019 Fiscal Year. (EN +$3,045,000 SD EX See Note)

LA SCR3

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2019-2020 Fiscal Year. (EN +$145,214,142 GF EX See Note)

LA HCR23

Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2022-2023 (EN +$108,165,219 EX See Note)